Senate | 05/08/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1696 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2886 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2656 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2656 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Record vote | RV#842 | Journal Page: 2656 |
House | 05/05/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2656 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2656 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2635 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Record vote | RV#836 | Journal Page: 2634 |
House | 05/04/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2634 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2634 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1768 | |
House | 04/11/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 689 | |
House | 03/15/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 689 | |
House | 02/22/2017 | Filed |