Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2275 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Paddie (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 2275
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 3, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of a service contract.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1304.003(b), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A service contract described by Subsection (a)(2)(A)
 may also provide for:
 (1)  incidental payment or indemnity under limited
 circumstances, including towing, rental, and emergency road
 service;
 (2)  the repair or replacement of a product for damage
 resulting from a power surge or for accidental damage incurred in
 handling the product; [or]
 (3)  identity recovery, if the service contract is
 financed under Chapter 348 or 353, Finance Code; or
 (4)  the replacement of a motor vehicle key or key fob
 in the event the key or key fob is inoperable, lost, or stolen.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1304.1581, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b)(1) or (c)(1), a provider
 is not required to deduct the amount of any claims paid under a
 service contract from the amount of a refund required under this
 section.
 SECTION 3.  Section 1304.159, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (c), a provider is not
 required to deduct the amount of any claims paid under a service
 contract from the amount of a refund a service contract holder is
 entitled to under this section.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a service contract entered into or renewed on or after the effective
 date of this Act.  A service contract entered into or renewed before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *