Senate | 05/08/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1621 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2646 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Record vote | RV#669 | Journal Page: 2352 |
House | 05/03/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2352 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2352 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2281 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2280 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1803 | |
House | 04/17/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 690 | |
House | 03/15/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 690 | |
House | 02/22/2017 | Filed |