Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2295 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/22/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    85R1526 JTS-F
 By: Villalba H.B. No. 2295


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing a comprehensive development agreement for
 the Interstate Highway 635 East project.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 223.201, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsections (f), (i), and (k) and adding Subsection
 (j-1) to read as follows:
 (f)  The department may enter into a comprehensive
 development agreement only for all or part of:
 (1)  the State Highway 99 (Grand Parkway) project;
 (2)  the Interstate Highway 35E managed lanes project
 in Dallas and Denton Counties from Interstate Highway 635 to U.S.
 Highway 380;
 (3)  the Interstate Highway 35W project in Tarrant
 County from Interstate Highway 30 to State Highway 114;
 (4)  the State Highway 183 managed lanes project in
 Tarrant and Dallas Counties from State Highway 121 to Interstate
 Highway 35E;
 (5)  the Interstate Highway 35E/U.S. Highway 67
 Southern Gateway project in Dallas County, including:
 (A)  Interstate Highway 35E from 8th Street to
 Interstate Highway 20; and
 (B)  U.S. Highway 67 from Interstate Highway 35E
 to Farm-to-Market Road 1382 (Belt Line Road);
 (6)  the State Highway 288 project from U.S. Highway 59
 to south of State Highway 6 in Brazoria County and Harris County;
 (7)  the U.S. Highway 290 managed lanes project in
 Harris County from Interstate Highway 610 to State Highway 99;
 (8)  the Interstate Highway 820 project from State
 Highway 183 to Randol Mill Road;
 (9)  the State Highway 114 project in Dallas County
 from State Highway 121 to State Highway 183;
 (10)  the Loop 12 project in Dallas County from State
 Highway 183 to Interstate Highway 35E;
 (11)  the Loop 9 project in Dallas and Ellis Counties
 from Interstate Highway 20 to U.S. Highway 67; [and]
 (12)  the U.S. Highway 181 Harbor Bridge project in
 Nueces County between U.S. Highway 181 at Beach Avenue and
 Interstate Highway 37; and
 (13)  the Interstate Highway 635 East project from U.S.
 Highway 75 to Royal Lane/Miller Road.
 (i)  The authority to enter into a comprehensive development
 agreement expires:
 (1)  August 31, 2017, for a project described by
 Subsection (f), other than the State Highway 99 (Grand Parkway)
 project and the Interstate Highway 635 East project [State Highway
 183 managed lanes project]; and
 (2)  August 31, 2021, for the Interstate Highway 635
 East project [2015, for the State Highway 183 managed lanes
 project].
 (j-1)  For the Interstate Highway 635 East project, the
 environmental clearance and financial plan required by Subsection
 (j) must be submitted not later than August 31, 2019.
 (k)  Not later than December 1, 2018 [2014], the department
 shall provide a report to the commission on the status of the
 Interstate Highway 635 project [a project described by Subsection
 (f)]. The report must include:
 (1)  the status of the project's environmental
 clearance;
 (2)  an explanation of any project delays; and
 (3)  if the procurement is not completed, the
 anticipated date for the completion of the procurement.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.