1 | 1 | | 85R1526 JTS-F |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Villalba H.B. No. 2295 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to authorizing a comprehensive development agreement for |
---|
8 | 8 | | the Interstate Highway 635 East project. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Section 223.201, Transportation Code, is amended |
---|
11 | 11 | | by amending Subsections (f), (i), and (k) and adding Subsection |
---|
12 | 12 | | (j-1) to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 13 | | (f) The department may enter into a comprehensive |
---|
14 | 14 | | development agreement only for all or part of: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (1) the State Highway 99 (Grand Parkway) project; |
---|
16 | 16 | | (2) the Interstate Highway 35E managed lanes project |
---|
17 | 17 | | in Dallas and Denton Counties from Interstate Highway 635 to U.S. |
---|
18 | 18 | | Highway 380; |
---|
19 | 19 | | (3) the Interstate Highway 35W project in Tarrant |
---|
20 | 20 | | County from Interstate Highway 30 to State Highway 114; |
---|
21 | 21 | | (4) the State Highway 183 managed lanes project in |
---|
22 | 22 | | Tarrant and Dallas Counties from State Highway 121 to Interstate |
---|
23 | 23 | | Highway 35E; |
---|
24 | 24 | | (5) the Interstate Highway 35E/U.S. Highway 67 |
---|
25 | 25 | | Southern Gateway project in Dallas County, including: |
---|
26 | 26 | | (A) Interstate Highway 35E from 8th Street to |
---|
27 | 27 | | Interstate Highway 20; and |
---|
28 | 28 | | (B) U.S. Highway 67 from Interstate Highway 35E |
---|
29 | 29 | | to Farm-to-Market Road 1382 (Belt Line Road); |
---|
30 | 30 | | (6) the State Highway 288 project from U.S. Highway 59 |
---|
31 | 31 | | to south of State Highway 6 in Brazoria County and Harris County; |
---|
32 | 32 | | (7) the U.S. Highway 290 managed lanes project in |
---|
33 | 33 | | Harris County from Interstate Highway 610 to State Highway 99; |
---|
34 | 34 | | (8) the Interstate Highway 820 project from State |
---|
35 | 35 | | Highway 183 to Randol Mill Road; |
---|
36 | 36 | | (9) the State Highway 114 project in Dallas County |
---|
37 | 37 | | from State Highway 121 to State Highway 183; |
---|
38 | 38 | | (10) the Loop 12 project in Dallas County from State |
---|
39 | 39 | | Highway 183 to Interstate Highway 35E; |
---|
40 | 40 | | (11) the Loop 9 project in Dallas and Ellis Counties |
---|
41 | 41 | | from Interstate Highway 20 to U.S. Highway 67; [and] |
---|
42 | 42 | | (12) the U.S. Highway 181 Harbor Bridge project in |
---|
43 | 43 | | Nueces County between U.S. Highway 181 at Beach Avenue and |
---|
44 | 44 | | Interstate Highway 37; and |
---|
45 | 45 | | (13) the Interstate Highway 635 East project from U.S. |
---|
46 | 46 | | Highway 75 to Royal Lane/Miller Road. |
---|
47 | 47 | | (i) The authority to enter into a comprehensive development |
---|
48 | 48 | | agreement expires: |
---|
49 | 49 | | (1) August 31, 2017, for a project described by |
---|
50 | 50 | | Subsection (f), other than the State Highway 99 (Grand Parkway) |
---|
51 | 51 | | project and the Interstate Highway 635 East project [State Highway |
---|
52 | 52 | | 183 managed lanes project]; and |
---|
53 | 53 | | (2) August 31, 2021, for the Interstate Highway 635 |
---|
54 | 54 | | East project [2015, for the State Highway 183 managed lanes |
---|
55 | 55 | | project]. |
---|
56 | 56 | | (j-1) For the Interstate Highway 635 East project, the |
---|
57 | 57 | | environmental clearance and financial plan required by Subsection |
---|
58 | 58 | | (j) must be submitted not later than August 31, 2019. |
---|
59 | 59 | | (k) Not later than December 1, 2018 [2014], the department |
---|
60 | 60 | | shall provide a report to the commission on the status of the |
---|
61 | 61 | | Interstate Highway 635 project [a project described by Subsection |
---|
62 | 62 | | (f)]. The report must include: |
---|
63 | 63 | | (1) the status of the project's environmental |
---|
64 | 64 | | clearance; |
---|
65 | 65 | | (2) an explanation of any project delays; and |
---|
66 | 66 | | (3) if the procurement is not completed, the |
---|
67 | 67 | | anticipated date for the completion of the procurement. |
---|
68 | 68 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|