LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
House
Bills
HB2319
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB2319
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HB2319
Compare Versions
HB2319 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2319 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2319 Enrolled May 27, 2017
HB2319 Comm Sub May 17, 2017
HB2319 Engrossed May 4, 2017
HB2319 Comm Sub April 19, 2017
HB2319 Introduced February 23, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
HB2319 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2319 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2319 Enrolled May 27, 2017
HB2319 Comm Sub May 17, 2017
HB2319 Engrossed May 4, 2017
HB2319 Comm Sub April 19, 2017
HB2319 Introduced February 23, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare