Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1365
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2190
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2109
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#551
|
Journal Page: 2109
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2109
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2108
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2052
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#507
|
Journal Page: 2051
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2051
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Turner
|
Journal Page: 2050
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2050
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 738
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 738
|
House
|
02/23/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|