Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Returned from the House for further action
|
|
Journal Page: 2093
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Returned to the Senate for further action
|
|
Journal Page: 3714
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3389
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 1875
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1874
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1874
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1874
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1874
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1874
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA4 Watson
|
Journal Page: 1873
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1873
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1873
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA5 Watson
|
Journal Page: 1873
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA4 Watson
|
Journal Page: 1870
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1869
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1867
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/15/17
|
Journal Page: 1755
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Watson
|
Journal Page: 1754
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1754
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1754
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1754
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1765
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1637
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1566
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1564
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Rereferred to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1564
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1531
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1531
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1365
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2190
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2102
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#543
|
Journal Page: 2102
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2102
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2102
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2048
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2048
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Schofield
|
Journal Page: 2048
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2048
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1475
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Referred to Government Transparency & Operation
|
|
Journal Page: 739
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 739
|
House
|
02/23/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|