House | 05/04/2017 | Postponed | 5/12/17 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2608 |
House | 05/04/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2607 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Postponed | 5/4/17 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1727 |
House | 04/20/2017 | Amendment adopted as amended | 7-Frank | Journal Page: 1727 |
House | 04/20/2017 | Amendment amended | 8-Giddings | Journal Page: 1727 |
House | 04/20/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | 7-Frank | Journal Page: 1727 |
House | 04/20/2017 | Vote reconsidered | 2-Miller | Journal Page: 1726 |
House | 04/20/2017 | Amendment withdrawn | 5-Frank | Journal Page: 1726 |
House | 04/20/2017 | Point of order overruled | Rule 4, Section 18(b) | Journal Page: 1724 |
House | 04/20/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1724 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Postponed | 4/20/17 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1568 |
House | 04/18/2017 | Amended | 4-Frank | Journal Page: 1567 |
House | 04/18/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1567 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Record vote | RV#273 | Journal Page: 1566 |
House | 04/18/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1565 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1111 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 653 | |
House | 03/14/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 653 | |
House | 02/23/2017 | Filed |