Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2369 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Nevárez (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 2369
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water & Rural Affairs; May 18, 2017, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 18, 2017, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to municipal fees charged to public school districts for
 water and sewer service.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The legislature finds that the imposition of
 fees for water service that are based on the number of students or
 employees of a public school district diverts to other purposes
 money appropriated in accordance with Section 1, Article VII, Texas
 Constitution, for the education of students. For that reason, the
 imposition of fees on those bases by a political subdivision
 violates the Texas Constitution.
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 13.044, Water Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 13.044.  RATES CHARGED BY MUNICIPALITY TO CERTAIN
 SPECIAL DISTRICTS [DISTRICT].
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter C, Chapter 13, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 13.0441 to read as follows:
 Sec. 13.0441.  FEES CHARGED BY MUNICIPALITY TO PUBLIC SCHOOL
 DISTRICTS. (a) This section applies only to fees charged by a
 municipality for water or sewer service to a public school
 district.
 (b)  Notwithstanding the provisions of a resolution,
 ordinance, or agreement, a public school district charged a fee
 that violates Section 13.088 may appeal the charge by filing a
 petition with the utility commission. The utility commission shall
 hear the appeal de novo, and the municipality charging the fee has
 the burden of proof to establish that the fee complies with Section
 13.088. The utility commission shall fix the fees to be charged by
 the municipality in accordance with this chapter, including Section
 13.088.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter D, Chapter 13, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 13.088 to read as follows:
 Sec. 13.088.  MUNICIPAL FEES FOR PUBLIC SCHOOL DISTRICTS.  A
 municipally owned utility that provides retail water or sewer
 utility service to a public school district may not charge the
 district a fee based on the number of district students or employees
 in addition to the rates the utility charges the district for the
 service.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *