House | 05/03/2017 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2419 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1003 | Journal Page: 2411 |
House | 05/03/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1803 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 722 | |
House | 03/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 722 | |
House | 02/24/2017 | Filed |