Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2378 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Larson (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 2378
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water & Rural Affairs; May 16, 2017, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 16, 2017, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to extensions of an expired permit for the transfer of
 groundwater from a groundwater conservation district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 36.122, Water Code, is amended by adding
 Subsections (j-1) and (j-2) and amending Subsection (k) to read as
 follows:
 (j-1)  A term under Subsection (i) or (j) shall automatically
 be extended on or before its expiration:
 (1)  to a term that is not shorter than the term of an
 operating permit for the production of water to be transferred that
 is in effect at the time of the extension; and
 (2)  for each additional term for which that operating
 permit for production is renewed under Section 36.1145 or remains
 in effect under Section 36.1146.
 (j-2)  A permit automatically extended under Subsection
 (j-1) continues to be subject to conditions contained in the permit
 as issued before the automatic extension.
 (k)  Notwithstanding the period specified under Subsection
 [in Subsections] (i), [and] (j), or (j-1) during which water may be
 transferred under a permit, a district may periodically review the
 amount of water that may be transferred under the permit and may
 limit the amount if additional factors considered in Subsection (f)
 warrant the limitation, subject to Subsection (c). The review
 described by this subsection may take place not more frequently
 than the period provided for the review or renewal of regular
 permits issued by the district. In its determination of whether to
 renew a permit issued under this section, the district shall
 consider relevant and current data for the conservation of
 groundwater resources and shall consider the permit in the same
 manner it would consider any other permit in the district.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 the term of a permit issued under Sections 36.122(i) and (j), Water
 Code, that expires after September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *