E
|
05/29/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/19/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4005
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2119
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2116
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3780
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4004
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3730
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1345
|
Journal Page: 3730
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3730
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3730
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3236
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1802
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1802
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1802
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1802
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1802
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1802
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1801
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1688
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 937
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1431
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1125
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#152
|
Journal Page: 1124
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1124
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1124
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1099
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1099
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 940
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 722
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 722
|
House
|
02/24/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|