E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4237
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3506
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5177
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1865
|
Journal Page: 5177
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5177
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4815
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2983
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2983
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2983
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2983
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2983
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2983
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2983
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Huffman
|
Journal Page: 2982
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2982
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2981
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2226
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2090
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1796
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1796
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1342
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2126
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1953
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#462
|
Journal Page: 1952
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1952
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1952
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1826
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1826
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Amended
|
2-Wu
|
Journal Page: 1825
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1825
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1431
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 284
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 284
|
House
|
11/14/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|