Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2409 House Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    85R22961 MCK-F
 By: Raney, González of El Paso, Simmons, H.B. No. 2409
 Shine, Romero, Jr., et al.
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2409:
 By:  Workman C.S.H.B. No. 2409


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to wage requirements for community rehabilitation
 programs participating in the purchasing from people with
 disabilities program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 122, Human Resources Code, is amended by
 adding Sections 122.0075 and 122.0076 to read as follows:
 Sec. 122.0075.  INCREASE IN WAGES; PLAN. (a) This section
 applies to a community rehabilitation program that:
 (1)  is participating in the program administered under
 this chapter; and
 (2)  pays workers with disabilities employed by the
 program wages that are less than the federal minimum wage under
 Section 6, Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 (29 U.S.C. Section 206).
 (b)  The workforce commission shall assist:
 (1)  a community rehabilitation program in developing a
 plan to increase the wages paid to its workers with disabilities to
 the federal minimum wage not later than September 1, 2019, for work
 relating to any products or services purchased from the community
 rehabilitation program through the program administered under this
 chapter; and
 (2)  a community rehabilitation program and any worker
 with a disability, or request, to ensure the increase in wages paid
 to a worker with a disability does not affect the worker's
 eligibility to receive any federal benefits the worker received or
 was eligible to receive before the wage increase.
 (c)  Each community rehabilitation program shall, to the
 maximum extent possible, ensure that each worker with a disability
 remains employed by the program after the program increases the
 wages paid to those employees in accordance with the plan developed
 under Subsection (b).
 (d)  If a community rehabilitation program is unable to
 employ all workers with a disability after the program increases
 the wages paid to those employees to the federal minimum wage, the
 community rehabilitation program shall work with the workforce
 commission and any other governmental entity to seek and obtain any
 job training that may be suitable for those former employees to find
 other employment that pays at least the federal minimum wage.
 (e)  In addition to the assistance described by Subsection
 (d), the workforce commission may, at the worker's request, assist
 a worker with a disability not retained by a community
 rehabilitation program to secure employment in a position that pays
 at least the federal minimum wage.
 (f)  On request of a community rehabilitation program, the
 workforce commission may extend the period for compliance with the
 program participation requirements of Section 122.0076 for not more
 than 12 months if the community rehabilitation program:
 (1)  requests the extension not later than July 1,
 2019;
 (2)  has demonstrated to the commission that an
 extension would be in the best interest of the program's employees
 with disabilities;
 (3)  has worked with the commission to develop a
 transition plan and made meaningful progress towards meeting the
 program participation requirements of Section 122.0076; and
 (4)  submits a revised transition plan to the
 commission detailing how an extension will allow the program to
 meet the program participation requirements of Section 122.0076.
 (g)  The workforce commission shall make a decision on a
 request for an extension under Subsection (f) not later than
 September 1, 2019. The commission may not grant more than one
 extension to a community rehabilitation program.
 (h)  Not later than January 31, 2019, the workforce
 commission shall report to the legislature regarding the
 implementation of this section.  The report must include any
 recommendations for legislative or agency rule changes necessary to
 assist the commission and community rehabilitation program in
 performing their duties under this section.
 (i)  This section expires September 1, 2021.
 Sec. 122.0076.  WAGE REQUIREMENTS. (a) A community
 rehabilitation program may not participate in the program
 administered under this chapter unless each worker with a
 disability employed by the program is paid at least the federal
 minimum wage under Section 6, Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 (29
 U.S.C. Section 206), for any work relating to any products or
 services purchased from the community rehabilitation program
 through the program administered under this chapter.
 (b)  To the extent of a conflict between this section and
 Chapter 62, Labor Code, this section controls.
 (c)  This section does not apply to a community
 rehabilitation program's eligibility to participate in the program
 administered under this chapter before the later of:
 (1)  September 1, 2019; or
 (2)  the date an extension granted under Section
 122.0075(f) expires.
 (d)  This subsection and Subsection (c) expire September 1,
 2021.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.