Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2409 House Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 27, 2017      TO: Honorable René Oliveira, Chair, House Committee on Business & Industry      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2409 by Raney (Relating to wage requirements for community rehabilitation programs participating in the purchasing from people with disabilities program.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the Human Resources Code relating to wage requirements for community rehabilitation programs participating in the Purchasing From People With Disabilities program. Section 122.0075 of the bill requires the Texas Workforce Commission (TWC) to assist community rehabilitation programs in developing a plan to increase the wages paid to its workers with disabilities to the federal minimum wage not later than September 1, 2019. TWC may extend the period for compliance with the program participation requirements of the bill. Section 122.0076 of the bill states community rehabilitation programs may not participate in the Purchasing From People With Disabilities program unless each worker is paid at least the federal minimum wage.Based on information provided by TWC, this analysis assumes the duties and responsibilities associated with implementing the provisions of the bill could be accomplished by utilizing existing resources. The bill would take effect on September 1, 2017. Section 122.0076 would not apply to a community rehabilitation program before the later of September 1, 2019 or the date an extension expires. Section 122.0075 and Section 122.0076(c-d) would expire on September 1, 2021. Local Government Impact According to the Texas Municipal League, the fiscal impact to municipalities to implement the provisions of the bill is not anticipated to be significant.     Source Agencies:320 Texas Workforce Commission   LBB Staff:  UP, CP, CL, EH, JGA    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 27, 2017





  TO: Honorable René Oliveira, Chair, House Committee on Business & Industry      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2409 by Raney (Relating to wage requirements for community rehabilitation programs participating in the purchasing from people with disabilities program.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable René Oliveira, Chair, House Committee on Business & Industry
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2409 by Raney (Relating to wage requirements for community rehabilitation programs participating in the purchasing from people with disabilities program.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable René Oliveira, Chair, House Committee on Business & Industry 

 Honorable René Oliveira, Chair, House Committee on Business & Industry 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2409 by Raney (Relating to wage requirements for community rehabilitation programs participating in the purchasing from people with disabilities program.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

HB2409 by Raney (Relating to wage requirements for community rehabilitation programs participating in the purchasing from people with disabilities program.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the Human Resources Code relating to wage requirements for community rehabilitation programs participating in the Purchasing From People With Disabilities program. Section 122.0075 of the bill requires the Texas Workforce Commission (TWC) to assist community rehabilitation programs in developing a plan to increase the wages paid to its workers with disabilities to the federal minimum wage not later than September 1, 2019. TWC may extend the period for compliance with the program participation requirements of the bill. Section 122.0076 of the bill states community rehabilitation programs may not participate in the Purchasing From People With Disabilities program unless each worker is paid at least the federal minimum wage.Based on information provided by TWC, this analysis assumes the duties and responsibilities associated with implementing the provisions of the bill could be accomplished by utilizing existing resources. The bill would take effect on September 1, 2017. Section 122.0076 would not apply to a community rehabilitation program before the later of September 1, 2019 or the date an extension expires. Section 122.0075 and Section 122.0076(c-d) would expire on September 1, 2021.

Local Government Impact

According to the Texas Municipal League, the fiscal impact to municipalities to implement the provisions of the bill is not anticipated to be significant. 

Source Agencies: 320 Texas Workforce Commission

320 Texas Workforce Commission

LBB Staff: UP, CP, CL, EH, JGA

 UP, CP, CL, EH, JGA