E
|
06/15/2017
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6066
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4237
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4823
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2113
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1798
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1798
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3239
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3062
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1049
|
Journal Page: 3062
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3062
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3062
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3037
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3037
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 790
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 790
|
House
|
02/24/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|