E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6065
|
E
|
05/25/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5573
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2963
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4565
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2274
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4150
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4151
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1524
|
Journal Page: 4150
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4150
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3999
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2237
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2237
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2237
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2237
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2237
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2237
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2237
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1952
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1366
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2190
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2091
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#532
|
Journal Page: 2090
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2090
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2090
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2035
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#503
|
Journal Page: 2034
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2034
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2034
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 1485
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1485
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1424
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
|
|
Journal Page: 790
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 790
|
House
|
02/24/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|