E
|
05/26/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5684
|
E
|
05/22/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2479
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4174
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4176
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3872
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1405
|
Journal Page: 3873
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3872
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3490
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Taylor of Galveston
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1828
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1297
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1811
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#377
|
Journal Page: 1810
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1810
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1810
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1780
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1780
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1780
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Postponed
|
4/24/17 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1739
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1739
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1430
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 792
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 792
|
House
|
02/27/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|