House | 05/03/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 726 | |
House | 03/07/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/13/2017 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 284 | |
House | 02/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 284 | |
House | 11/14/2016 | Filed |