Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2443 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 27, 2017      TO: Honorable René Oliveira, Chair, House Committee on Business & Industry      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2443 by González, Mary (Relating to the electronic submission of a wage claim to the Texas Workforce Commission.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the Labor Code relating to the electronic submission of a wage claim to the Texas Workforce Commission (TWC). Based on the LBB's analysis of TWC, this analysis assumes the duties and responsibilities associated with implementing the provisions of the bill could be accomplished by utilizing existing resources.The bill would take effect September 1, 2017; however, the provisions of the bill would only apply to a wage claim that is filed on or after January 1, 2018. TWC would be required to adopt rules for the administration of the section no later than December 1, 2017. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:320 Texas Workforce Commission   LBB Staff:  UP, CL, EH, CP    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 27, 2017





  TO: Honorable René Oliveira, Chair, House Committee on Business & Industry      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2443 by González, Mary (Relating to the electronic submission of a wage claim to the Texas Workforce Commission.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable René Oliveira, Chair, House Committee on Business & Industry
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2443 by González, Mary (Relating to the electronic submission of a wage claim to the Texas Workforce Commission.), As Introduced

 Honorable René Oliveira, Chair, House Committee on Business & Industry 

 Honorable René Oliveira, Chair, House Committee on Business & Industry 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2443 by González, Mary (Relating to the electronic submission of a wage claim to the Texas Workforce Commission.), As Introduced

HB2443 by González, Mary (Relating to the electronic submission of a wage claim to the Texas Workforce Commission.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the Labor Code relating to the electronic submission of a wage claim to the Texas Workforce Commission (TWC). Based on the LBB's analysis of TWC, this analysis assumes the duties and responsibilities associated with implementing the provisions of the bill could be accomplished by utilizing existing resources.The bill would take effect September 1, 2017; however, the provisions of the bill would only apply to a wage claim that is filed on or after January 1, 2018. TWC would be required to adopt rules for the administration of the section no later than December 1, 2017.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 320 Texas Workforce Commission

320 Texas Workforce Commission

LBB Staff: UP, CL, EH, CP

 UP, CL, EH, CP