H.B. No. 2443 AN ACT relating to the electronic submission of a wage claim to the Texas Workforce Commission. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 61.051(d), Labor Code, is amended to read as follows: (d) The employee may file the wage claim: (1) in person at an office of the commission; (2) by mailing the claim to an address designated by the commission; (3) by faxing the claim to a fax number designated by the commission; [or] (4) electronically in a manner designated by the commission by rule; or (5) by any other means adopted by the commission by rule. SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2017, the Texas Workforce Commission shall adopt rules for the administration of Section 61.051(d), Labor Code, as amended by this Act. SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only to a wage claim that is filed with the Texas Workforce Commission on or after January 1, 2018. A wage claim filed before that date is governed by the law in effect on the date that the claim was filed, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2443 was passed by the House on May 9, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2443 was passed by the Senate on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: _____________________ Date _____________________ Governor