House | 05/11/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2299 | |
House | 05/01/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 763 | |
House | 03/21/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 763 | |
House | 02/27/2017 | Filed |