Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1798
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1798
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3239
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3062
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1049
|
Journal Page: 3062
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3062
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3062
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3038
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3038
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Corrected comm. rept. sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Corrected comm. report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2759
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2759
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 763
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 763
|
House
|
02/27/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|