House
|
05/08/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2885
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2434
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/3/17 6:15 PM
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1802
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 901
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 765
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 765
|
House
|
02/27/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|