E | 06/15/2017 | Effective on 1/1/18 | ||
E | 06/15/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6065 | |
E | 05/30/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6062 | |
Senate | 05/30/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4242 | |
House | 05/29/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6059 | |
House | 05/28/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6062 | |
House | 05/25/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4823 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3040 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3040 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3040 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3040 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3040 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3040 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3040 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2880 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2447 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 2206 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2206 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1697 | |
House | 05/07/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3026 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Record vote | RV#933 | Journal Page: 2806 |
House | 05/06/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2806 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2806 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2708 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2708 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1842 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 766 | |
House | 03/21/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 766 | |
House | 02/27/2017 | Filed |