E
|
06/01/2017
|
Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
|
September 1, 2020
|
|
E
|
06/01/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/24/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5095
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2605
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4358
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3982
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3982
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1451
|
Journal Page: 3982
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3982
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3745
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Statement(s) submitted
|
|
Journal Page: 2086
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2086
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2086
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2086
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2085
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hancock
|
Journal Page: 2025
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2025
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2025
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1903
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1727
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1727
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1692
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3026
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2842
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#978
|
Journal Page: 2841
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2841
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
3-Neave
|
Journal Page: 2840
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2838
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#881
|
Journal Page: 2752
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2752
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Amended
|
11-Israel
|
Journal Page: 2751
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2751
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
10-J. Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 2750
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
9-Alonzo
|
Journal Page: 2749
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2742
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/5/17 8:35 PM
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 866
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2017
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 346
|
House
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 346
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|