LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
House
Bills
HB2533
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB2533
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HB2533
Compare Versions
HB2533 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2533 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2533 Enrolled May 25, 2017
HB2533 Comm Sub May 18, 2017
HB2533 Engrossed May 9, 2017
HB2533 Comm Sub April 26, 2017
HB2533 Introduced February 28, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
HB2533 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2533 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2533 Enrolled May 25, 2017
HB2533 Comm Sub May 18, 2017
HB2533 Engrossed May 9, 2017
HB2533 Comm Sub April 26, 2017
HB2533 Introduced February 28, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare