House | 04/13/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 1068 | |
House | 03/23/2017 | Referred to Special Purpose Districts | Journal Page: 833 | |
House | 03/23/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 833 | |
House | 03/01/2017 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 02/28/2017 | Filed |