E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6065
|
E
|
05/28/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5680
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5683
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2968
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4720
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4721
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1789
|
Journal Page: 4721
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4720
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4567
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2589
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2589
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2589
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2589
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2589
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2589
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2589
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Estes
|
Journal Page: 2586
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2586
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2585
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2072
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1900
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1900
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1670
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2760
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2520
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#735
|
Journal Page: 2520
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2520
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2520
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2470
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2470
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1803
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 1068
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
Journal Page: 844
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 844
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|