1 | | - | By: Hernandez, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 257 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2017; |
---|
3 | | - | May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran |
---|
4 | | - | Affairs & Border Security; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the |
---|
5 | | - | following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 257 |
---|
10 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 5 | | relating to a report by the Texas Workforce Commission regarding |
---|
12 | 6 | | the transition from military service to employment. |
---|
13 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 302, Labor Code, is |
---|
15 | 9 | | amended by adding Section 302.020 to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 10 | | Sec. 302.020. REPORT ON TRANSITION FROM MILITARY SERVICE TO |
---|
17 | 11 | | EMPLOYMENT. Not later than September 1 of each year, the |
---|
18 | 12 | | commission, in consultation with the Texas Coordinating Council for |
---|
19 | 13 | | Veterans Services, shall submit to the governor, lieutenant |
---|
20 | 14 | | governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and chairs of |
---|
21 | 15 | | the legislative committees with appropriate jurisdiction a report |
---|
22 | 16 | | that: |
---|
23 | 17 | | (1) identifies: |
---|
24 | 18 | | (A) the five most common military occupational |
---|
25 | 19 | | specialties of servicemembers who are transitioning from military |
---|
26 | 20 | | service to employment; |
---|
27 | 21 | | (B) the five occupations for which the military |
---|
28 | 22 | | occupational specialties identified in Paragraph (A) best offer |
---|
29 | 23 | | transferable skills that meet the needs of employers; and |
---|
30 | 24 | | (C) any industry-based certifications that align |
---|
31 | 25 | | with the military occupational specialties identified in Paragraph |
---|
32 | 26 | | (A); and |
---|
33 | 27 | | (2) includes any other data or other information |
---|
34 | 28 | | identified by the commission in administering the College Credit |
---|
35 | 29 | | for Heroes program under Section 302.0031 as useful for supporting |
---|
36 | 30 | | the transition of servicemembers and veterans into the occupations |
---|
37 | 31 | | identified under Subdivision (1)(B). |
---|
38 | 32 | | SECTION 2. Not later than September 1, 2018, the Texas |
---|
39 | 33 | | Workforce Commission shall submit the initial report required by |
---|
40 | 34 | | Section 302.020, Labor Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
41 | 35 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
42 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 36 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 37 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 38 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 257 was passed by the House on April |
---|
| 39 | + | 12, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 130, Nays 16, 1 present, not |
---|
| 40 | + | voting. |
---|
| 41 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 42 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 43 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 257 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 44 | + | 18, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 1. |
---|
| 45 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 46 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 47 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 48 | + | Date |
---|
| 49 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 50 | + | Governor |
---|