Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2579 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Holland, Longoria (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 2579
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 1, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 10, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 10, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the bond and other coverages required to be maintained
 by or for the benefit of a savings bank.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 92.156, Finance Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 Sec. 92.156.  FINANCIAL INSTITUTION BOND [INDEMNITY BONDS OF
 DIRECTORS, OFFICERS, AND EMPLOYEES]. (a) A savings bank shall
 maintain a financial institution [blanket indemnity] bond that
 provides [with an] adequate coverage to protect [corporate surety
 protecting] the savings bank from loss:
 (1)  by or through dishonest or criminal action or
 omission, including fraud, theft, or misplacement [robbery, or
 burglary], by any of the following persons:
 (A)  an officer or employee of the savings bank;
 (B)  an attorney retained by the savings bank;
 (C)  a nonemployee performing data processing
 services for the savings bank; or
 (D)  a director of the savings bank performing a
 [when the director performs the] duty of an officer or employee; or
 (2)  by other perils such as robbery, burglary,
 forgery, or alteration.
 (b)  A savings bank that employs a collection agent who is
 not covered by the bond required by Subsection (a) shall:
 (1)  ensure that the savings bank is included as a loss
 payee in the collection agent's crime coverage; and
 (2)  obtain a certificate of insurance evidencing the
 sufficiency of the collection agent's crime coverage [provide for
 the bonding of the agent in an amount equal to at least twice the
 average monthly collection of the agent unless the agent is a
 financial institution insured by the Federal Deposit Insurance
 Corporation. An agent shall settle with the savings bank at least
 monthly].
 (c)  Subject to rules adopted under Subsection (e), the board
 shall, at least annually, review and approve:
 (1)  the coverage, including the amount of the
 coverage, provided by the bond and the form of the bond; and
 (2)  the sustainability [sufficiency] of the corporate
 surety or insurer that issued the bond.
 (d)  The bond must provide that a cancellation or other
 termination by the corporate surety or insurer or by the insured is
 not effective until the earlier of:
 (1)  the date the commissioner approves; or
 (2)  the 30th day after the date written notice of the
 cancellation is given to the commissioner.
 (e)  The finance commission may adopt rules establishing:
 (1)  the coverage, including the amount of the
 coverage, that must be provided by the bond and the form of the
 bond; and
 (2)  the sustainability [sufficiency] of the corporate
 surety or insurer that issues the bond.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2018:
 (1)  a savings bank that maintains a bond under Section
 92.156, Finance Code, on the effective date of this Act shall obtain
 a bond that satisfies the requirements of Section 92.156, Finance
 Code, as amended by this Act; and
 (2)  a collection agent employed by a savings bank
 shall maintain crime coverage in compliance with Section 92.156(b),
 Finance Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *