Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2580 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Holland, Longoria (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 2580
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 3, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 9, 2017, reported favorably
 by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 9, 2017, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to criminal history record information obtained by the
 savings and mortgage lending commissioner.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 411.1385, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 411.1385.  ACCESS TO CRIMINAL HISTORY RECORD
 INFORMATION:  SAVINGS AND MORTGAGE LENDING COMMISSIONER. (a) The
 savings and mortgage lending commissioner is entitled to obtain
 from the department criminal history record information maintained
 by the department that relates to a person who is:
 (1)  an applicant for or holder of a license, charter,
 or other authority granted or issued by the savings and mortgage
 lending commissioner under:
 (A)  Subtitle B or C, Title 3, Finance Code; or
 (B)  Chapter 156, [or] 157, 158, or 180, Finance
 Code;
 (2)  an employee of or volunteer with the Department of
 Savings and Mortgage Lending;
 (3)  an applicant for employment or an internship with
 the Department of Savings and Mortgage Lending; or
 (4)  a contractor or subcontractor of the Department of
 Savings and Mortgage Lending.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), the savings and
 mortgage lending commissioner may not release or disclose criminal
 history record information obtained under this section unless:
 (1)  the information is obtained from a
 fingerprint-based search; and
 (2)  the information is released or disclosed:
 (A)  on court order;
 (B)  to the person who is the subject of the
 criminal history record information; or
 (C)  with the consent of the person who is the
 subject of the criminal history record information.
 (c)  Criminal history record information obtained by the
 savings and mortgage lending commissioner under Subsection (a) with
 respect to the issuance of a license under Chapter 156, Finance
 Code, may be released or disclosed only as provided by Section
 156.206, Finance Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *