Senate | 05/11/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1900 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1900 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1785 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3239 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | RV#1049 | Journal Page: 3062 |
House | 05/09/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3062 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3062 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3038 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3038 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2645 | |
House | 05/01/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 845 | |
House | 03/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 845 | |
House | 02/28/2017 | Filed |