Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2588 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Clardy (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 2588
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 12, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 17, 2017, reported favorably
 by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to access to criminal history record information by the
 Railroad Commission of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 411, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 411.1403 to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.1403.  ACCESS TO CRIMINAL HISTORY RECORD
 INFORMATION: RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS. (a) The Railroad
 Commission of Texas is entitled to obtain from the department, the
 Federal Bureau of Investigation Criminal Justice Information
 Services Division, or another law enforcement agency criminal
 history record information maintained by the department, division,
 or agency that relates to a person who is:
 (1)  an applicant for employment with, or who is or has
 been employed by, the commission; or
 (2)  a consultant, contract employee, independent
 contractor, intern, or volunteer for the commission or an applicant
 to serve in one of those positions.
 (b)  Criminal history record information obtained by the
 Railroad Commission of Texas under Subsection (a) may be used only
 to evaluate an applicant for employment with, or a current or former
 employee of, the commission.
 (c)  The Railroad Commission of Texas may not release or
 disclose information obtained under Subsection (a) except on court
 order or with the consent of the person who is the subject of the
 criminal history record information.
 (d)  After the expiration of any probationary term of the
 person's employment or not later than the 180th day after the date
 of receipt of the information, whichever is later, the Railroad
 Commission of Texas shall destroy all criminal history record
 information obtained under Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *