Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2612 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Meyer, Fallon (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 2612
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2017;
 May 11, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 18, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to civil liability of a person who produces, distributes,
 sells, or provides or aids in the production, distribution, sale,
 or provision of certain synthetic substances to another person for
 damages caused by the other person and to certain actions and
 investigations under the Deceptive Trade Practices-Consumer
 Protection Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 481, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 481.1191 to read as follows:
 Sec. 481.1191.  CIVIL LIABILITY FOR ENGAGING IN OR AIDING IN
 PRODUCTION, DISTRIBUTION, SALE, OR PROVISION OF SYNTHETIC
 SUBSTANCES. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Minor" means a person younger than 18 years of
 age.
 (2)  "Synthetic substance" means an artificial
 substance that produces and is intended by the manufacturer to
 produce when consumed or ingested an effect similar to or in excess
 of the effect produced by the consumption or ingestion of a
 controlled substance or controlled substance analogue, as those
 terms are defined by Section 481.002.
 (b)  A person is liable for damages proximately caused by the
 consumption or ingestion of a synthetic substance by another person
 if the actor:
 (1)  produced, distributed, sold, or provided the
 synthetic substance to the other person; or
 (2)  aided in the production, distribution, sale, or
 provision of the synthetic substance to the other person.
 (c)  A person is strictly liable for all damages caused by
 the consumption or ingestion of a synthetic substance by a minor if
 the actor:
 (1)  produced, distributed, sold, or provided the
 synthetic substance to the minor; or
 (2)  aided in the production, distribution, sale, or
 provision of the synthetic substance to the minor.
 (d)  A person who is found liable under this section or other
 law for any amount of damages arising from the consumption or
 ingestion by another of a synthetic substance is jointly and
 severally liable with any other person for the entire amount of
 damages awarded.
 (e)  Chapter 33, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, does not
 apply to an action brought under this section or an action brought
 under Section 17.50, Business & Commerce Code, based on conduct
 made actionable under Subsection (f) of this section.
 (f)  Conduct for which Subsection (b) or (c) creates
 liability is a false, misleading, or deceptive act or practice or an
 unconscionable action or course of action for purposes of Section
 17.50, Business & Commerce Code, and that conduct is:
 (1)  actionable under Subchapter E, Chapter 17,
 Business & Commerce Code; and
 (2)  subject to any remedy prescribed by that
 subchapter.
 (g)  An action brought under this section may include a claim
 for exemplary damages, which may be awarded in accordance with
 Section 41.003, Civil Practice and Remedies Code.
 (h)  Section 41.008, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, does
 not apply to the award of exemplary damages in an action brought
 under this section.
 (i)  Section 41.005, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, does
 not apply to a claim for exemplary damages in an action brought
 under this section.
 (j)  It is an affirmative defense to liability under this
 section that the synthetic substance produced, distributed, sold,
 or provided was approved for use, sale, or distribution by the
 United States Food and Drug Administration or other state or
 federal regulatory agency with authority to approve a substance for
 use, sale, or distribution.
 (k)  It is not a defense to liability under this section that
 a synthetic substance was in packaging labeled with "Not for Human
 Consumption" or other wording indicating the substance is not
 intended to be ingested.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter E, Chapter 17, Business & Commerce
 Code, is amended by adding Section 17.463 to read as follows:
 Sec. 17.463.  PRODUCTION, SALE, DISTRIBUTION, OR PROMOTION
 OF CERTAIN SYNTHETIC SUBSTANCES. (a)  This section applies only to
 an act described by Section 17.46(b)(31).
 (b)  Subject to Subsection (e) and except as otherwise
 provided by this section, an act to which this section applies is
 subject to action by a district or county attorney under Sections
 17.47, 17.58, 17.60, and 17.61 to the same extent as the act is
 subject to action by the consumer protection division under those
 sections.
 (c)  If a district or county attorney, under the authority of
 this section, accepts assurance of voluntary compliance under
 Section 17.58, the district or county attorney must file the
 assurance of voluntary compliance in the district court in the
 county in which the alleged violator resides or does business.
 (d)  If a district or county attorney, under the authority of
 this section, executes and serves a civil investigative demand and
 files a petition described by Section 17.61(g), the petition must
 be filed in the district court in the county where the parties
 reside.
 (e)  A district or county attorney may act under this section
 so long as the consumer protection division does not intend to act
 with respect to that matter.  Further, consistent with Section
 17.48(b) of this subchapter, the consumer protection division
 shall, upon request and to the extent it has the resources
 available, provide assistance to a district or county attorney in
 any action taken under this subchapter.  A district or county
 attorney may institute a suit described by this section on or after
 the 90th day after the date the attorney general receives the notice
 required by Section 17.48 unless before the 90th day after the date
 the notice is received the attorney general responds that it is
 actively investigating or litigating at least one of the alleged
 violations set forth in the notice.  The consumer protection
 division shall notify the district or county attorney it no longer
 intends to actively investigate or litigate an alleged violation
 within a reasonable time of such determination.
 (f)  Notwithstanding any other law, in an action brought by a
 district or county attorney under this section, all settlements or
 penalties collected by the district or county attorney shall be
 divided between the state and the county in which the attorney
 brought suit, with:
 (1)  50 percent of the amount collected paid to the
 comptroller for deposit to the credit of the basic civil legal
 services account established by Section 51.943, Government Code;
 and
 (2)  50 percent of the amount collected paid to the
 county shall be deposited by the county in a segregated account and
 the funds shall be used only for law enforcement, public health
 programs, or drug abuse prevention programs.
 SECTION 3.   This Act applies only to a cause of action that
 accrues on or after the effective date of this Act. A cause of
 action that accrued before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law applicable to the cause of action immediately
 before the effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *