Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2619 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Giddings, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 2619
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2017;
3- May 17, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
4- Justice; May 21, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
5- Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 21, 2017, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 2619
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to grant programs to maintain peace officers' mental
126 health and provide critical incident stress debriefing for certain
137 officers.
148 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
159 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 772, Government Code, is
1610 amended by adding Section 772.0073 to read as follows:
1711 Sec. 772.0073. PEACE OFFICER MENTAL HEALTH GRANT PROGRAM.
1812 (a) In this section:
1913 (1) "Law enforcement agency" means an agency of the
2014 state or an agency of a political subdivision of the state
2115 authorized by law to employ peace officers.
2216 (2) "Criminal justice division" means the criminal
2317 justice division established under Section 772.006.
2418 (b) The criminal justice division shall establish and
2519 administer a grant program through which a law enforcement agency
2620 may apply for a grant to implement programs, practices, and
2721 services designed to address the direct or indirect emotional harm
2822 suffered by peace officers employed by the law enforcement agency
2923 in the course of the officers' duties or as the result of the
3024 commission of crimes by other persons.
3125 (c) Grant money awarded under this section may be used to
3226 pay for:
3327 (1) mental health counseling and other mental health
3428 care;
3529 (2) personnel costs incurred by the department as a
3630 result of providing direct services and supporting activities under
3731 an implemented program, practice, or service;
3832 (3) skills training for department personnel related
3933 to providing direct services under an implemented program,
4034 practice, or service; and
4135 (4) evaluation of an implemented program, practice, or
4236 service to determine its effectiveness.
4337 (d) Information obtained in the administration of a
4438 program, practice, or service funded by a grant made under this
4539 section is confidential and is not subject to disclosure under
4640 Chapter 552.
4741 (e) A law enforcement agency may not use against a peace
4842 officer in a departmental proceeding any information obtained in
4943 the administration of a program, practice, or service funded by a
5044 grant made under this section.
5145 (f) The criminal justice division shall establish:
5246 (1) eligibility criteria for grant applicants;
5347 (2) grant application procedures;
5448 (3) guidelines relating to grant amounts;
5549 (4) procedures for evaluating grant applications; and
5650 (5) procedures for monitoring the use of a grant
5751 awarded under the program and ensuring compliance with any
5852 conditions of a grant.
5953 (g) The criminal justice division shall evaluate and
6054 compare the programs, practices, and services implemented by each
6155 law enforcement agency that receives a grant under this section to
6256 determine the most successful programs, practices, and services for
6357 maintaining the mental health of peace officers.
6458 (h) The criminal justice division may contract with a third
6559 party to conduct the evaluations and comparison described by
6660 Subsection (g).
6761 (i) The criminal justice division shall include in the
6862 biennial report required by Section 772.006(a)(9) a detailed
6963 reporting of the results and performance of the grant program
7064 administered under this section.
7165 (j) The criminal justice division may use any available
7266 funds to implement this section.
7367 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 772, Government Code, is
7468 amended by adding Section 772.0074 to read as follows:
7569 Sec. 772.0074. CRITICAL INCIDENT STRESS DEBRIEFING GRANT
7670 PROGRAM. (a) In this section:
7771 (1) "Criminal justice division" means the criminal
7872 justice division established under Section 772.006.
7973 (2) "Critical incident" means an incident involving a
8074 peace officer that occurs while the officer is performing official
8175 duties and that results in serious bodily injury to the officer or
8276 poses a substantial risk of serious bodily injury or death to the
8377 officer or of serious harm to the officer's mental health or
8478 well-being.
8579 (3) "Law enforcement agency" means an agency of the
8680 state or an agency of a political subdivision of the state that is
8781 authorized by law to employ peace officers.
8882 (4) "Peace officer" has the meaning assigned by
8983 Article 2.12, Code of Criminal Procedure.
9084 (b) The criminal justice division shall establish and
9185 administer a grant program to assist law enforcement agencies in
9286 providing critical incident stress debriefing to peace officers who
9387 experience critical incidents while performing official duties.
9488 (c) The criminal justice division may award a grant under
9589 this section to:
9690 (1) a law enforcement agency for the agency to provide
9791 critical incident stress debriefing to peace officers employed by
9892 the agency; or
9993 (2) any other agency, organization with a focus on
10094 mental health or trauma-related issues, or university with relevant
10195 expertise and experience to assist in providing support for the
10296 grant program, including support related to the development,
10397 implementation, management, or evaluation of the grant program, as
10498 determined necessary by the division.
10599 (d) A law enforcement agency that receives a grant under
106100 this section must:
107101 (1) inform each peace officer employed by the agency
108102 about:
109103 (A) the program, including opportunities to
110104 participate in the program; and
111105 (B) if the officer participates in the program,
112106 the confidentiality protections described by Subsection (e); and
113107 (2) certify in writing that the agency will not use
114108 disciplinary action or any other form of punishment, including the
115109 refusal of a promotion, to discourage or prohibit an officer's
116110 participation in the critical incident stress debriefing offered by
117111 the agency.
118112 (e) Critical incident stress debriefing provided using
119113 money distributed under the grant program is subject to the
120114 confidentiality protections provided under Section 784.003, Health
121115 and Safety Code.
122116 (f) The criminal justice division shall establish:
123117 (1) eligibility criteria for grant applicants;
124118 (2) grant application procedures;
125119 (3) procedures for evaluating grant applications;
126120 (4) the minimum qualifications necessary for a person
127121 to conduct critical incident stress debriefing that is provided
128122 using money distributed under the grant program; and
129123 (5) guidance for the development of critical incident
130124 stress debriefing curricula, materials, and best practices.
131125 (g) The criminal justice division shall include in the
132126 biennial report required by Section 772.006(a)(9) a detailed
133127 reporting of the results and performance of the grant program
134128 administered under this section.
135129 SECTION 3. Not later than October 1, 2017, the criminal
136130 justice division of the governor's office shall establish the grant
137131 program required by Section 772.0074, Government Code, as added by
138132 this Act, and, not later than January 1, 2018, shall begin to award
139133 grants under the program.
140134 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
141- * * * * *
135+ ______________________________ ______________________________
136+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
137+ I certify that H.B. No. 2619 was passed by the House on May 9,
138+ 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 123, Nays 16, 1 present, not
139+ voting.
140+ ______________________________
141+ Chief Clerk of the House
142+ I certify that H.B. No. 2619 was passed by the Senate on May
143+ 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
144+ ______________________________
145+ Secretary of the Senate
146+ APPROVED: _____________________
147+ Date
148+ _____________________
149+ Governor