Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2637 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/01/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            85R9932 JRJ-D
 By: Faircloth H.B. No. 2637


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorization by the Texas Higher Education
 Coordinating Board for certain public junior colleges to offer
 baccalaureate degree programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 130.0012, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (b), and (e) and adding Subsections
 (b-4), (b-5), (b-6), and (g-1) to read as follows:
 (a)  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board may
 [shall] authorize public junior colleges to offer baccalaureate
 degree programs in the fields of applied science, [and] applied
 technology, and nursing under this section. Offering a
 baccalaureate degree program under this section does not otherwise
 alter the role and mission of a public junior college.
 (b)  The coordinating board:
 (1)  shall authorize baccalaureate degree programs at
 each public junior college that previously participated in a pilot
 project to offer baccalaureate degree programs; and
 (2)  may authorize baccalaureate degree programs at one
 or more public junior colleges that offer a degree program in the
 field of nursing and have demonstrated a workforce need.
 (b-4)  The coordinating board shall establish a pilot
 project to examine the feasibility and effectiveness of authorizing
 not more than two baccalaureate degree programs, one in the field of
 applied science or applied technology, and one in the field of
 nursing at a public junior college with a main campus located on a
 barrier island and at a public junior college with not more than
 three main campuses located in a county with a population greater
 than 3.3 million.
 (b-5)  Not later than January 1, 2019, the coordinating board
 shall prepare a progress report on the pilot project established
 under Subsection (b-4). Not later than January 1, 2021, the
 coordinating board shall prepare a report on the effectiveness of
 the pilot project, including any recommendations for legislative
 action regarding the offering of baccalaureate degree programs in
 the fields of applied science, applied technology, and nursing by a
 public junior college. The coordinating board shall deliver a copy
 of each report to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the
 speaker of the house of representatives, and the chair of the
 standing committee of each house of the legislature with primary
 jurisdiction over higher education. Unless the authority to
 continue offering a baccalaureate degree program in the fields of
 applied science, applied technology, and nursing is continued by
 the legislature, a public junior college may not:
 (1)  enroll a new student in a baccalaureate degree
 program under the pilot project after the 2022 fall semester;
 (2)  offer junior-level or senior-level courses for
 those degree programs after the 2025 fall semester, unless the
 coordinating board authorizes the college to offer those courses;
 or
 (3)  award a baccalaureate degree under the pilot
 project after the 2025 fall semester, unless the coordinating board
 approves the awarding of the degree.
 (b-6)  This subsection and Subsections (b-4) and (b-5)
 expire on the first December 31 following the first regular
 legislative session that occurs after the sixth anniversary of the
 date a public junior college offering a degree program in the fields
 of applied science, applied technology, and nursing under
 Subsection (b-4) meets the accreditation requirements of
 Subsection (c).
 (e)  In determining what baccalaureate degree programs are
 to be offered, the coordinating board shall consider the following
 factors:
 (1)  the workforce need for the degree programs in the
 region served by the junior college;
 (2)  how those degree programs would complement the
 other programs and course offerings of the junior college and
 whether the associate degree program offered by the junior college
 in the same field has been successful;
 (3)  whether those degree programs would unnecessarily
 duplicate the degree programs offered by other institutions of
 higher education or whether a partnership with other institutions
 of higher education is possible; [and]
 (4)  the ability of the junior college to support the
 program with student enrollment and the adequacy of the junior
 college's facilities, faculty, administration, libraries, and
 other resources; and
 (5)  whether the junior college meets the taxable
 property valuation amount established in Section 130.032.
 (g-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (g), a degree program
 established under Subsection (b-4) may be funded solely by a public
 junior college's proportionate share of state appropriations under
 Section 130.003, local funds, and private sources.  This subsection
 expires January 1, 2022.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.