E
|
06/09/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6034
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4122
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4122
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3793
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5644
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1949
|
Journal Page: 5643
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5641
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3681
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3605
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3605
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3536
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3536
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3536
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5346
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5346
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5346
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4835
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3079
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3079
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3079
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3079
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3079
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3079
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3079
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 3076
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3076
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3076
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 3140
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3055
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2880
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2878
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2447
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1681
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2760
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2554
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#766
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2403
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2403
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1803
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 770
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 770
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|