H.B. No. 2639 AN ACT relating to an alert for a missing senior citizen or person with Alzheimer's disease. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. The heading to Subchapter M, Chapter 411, Government Code, is amended to read as follows: SUBCHAPTER M. SILVER ALERT FOR MISSING SENIOR CITIZENS AND PERSONS WITH ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE SECTION 2. Sections 411.381(1) and (2), Government Code, are amended to read as follows: (1) "Alert" means the statewide silver alert for missing senior citizens and persons with Alzheimer's disease, as developed and implemented under this subchapter. (2) "Local law enforcement agency" means a local law enforcement agency with jurisdiction over the investigation of a missing senior citizen or person with Alzheimer's disease. SECTION 3. Section 411.382, Government Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 411.382. SILVER ALERT FOR MISSING SENIOR CITIZENS AND PERSONS WITH ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE. With the cooperation of the Texas Department of Transportation, the office of the governor, and other appropriate law enforcement agencies in this state, the department shall develop and implement a statewide silver alert to be activated on behalf of a missing senior citizen or person with Alzheimer's disease. SECTION 4. Section 411.383(b), Government Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) The director shall adopt rules and issue directives as necessary to ensure proper implementation of the alert. The rules and directives must include: (1) the procedures to be used by a local law enforcement agency to verify whether a person reported missing is a senior citizen with [: [(A) is missing; and [(B) has] an impaired mental condition or a person with Alzheimer's disease and whether the person's location is unknown; (2) a description of the circumstances under which a local law enforcement agency is required to report a missing senior citizen or person with Alzheimer's disease to the department; and (3) the procedures to be used by an individual or entity to report information about a missing senior citizen or person with Alzheimer's disease to designated media outlets in Texas. SECTION 5. Section 411.386, Government Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 411.386. NOTIFICATION TO DEPARTMENT OF MISSING SENIOR CITIZEN OR PERSON WITH ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE. (a) A local law enforcement agency may notify the department if the agency: (1) receives notice of a missing senior citizen or person with Alzheimer's disease; (2) verifies that at the time the senior citizen or person with Alzheimer's disease is reported missing: (A) the person reported missing: (i) is 65 years of age or older and has an impaired mental condition; or (ii) is a person with Alzheimer's disease; and (B) the person's [senior citizen's] location is unknown; and [(C) the senior citizen has an impaired mental condition; and] (3) determines that the person's [senior citizen's] disappearance poses a credible threat to the person's [senior citizen's] health and safety. (b) The local law enforcement agency shall: (1) require the family or legal guardian of the missing senior citizen or person with Alzheimer's disease to provide documentation of the person's age and [senior citizen's impaired mental] condition to verify the person's status [condition] as described [required] by Subsection (a)(2)(A) [(a)(2)(C)]; and (2) as soon as practicable, determine whether the person's [senior citizen's] disappearance poses a credible threat to the person's [senior citizen's] health and safety for purposes of Subsection (a)(3). SECTION 6. Section 411.387(b), Government Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) In issuing the alert, the department shall send the alert to designated media outlets in Texas. Following receipt of the alert, participating radio stations and[,] television stations[,] and other participating media outlets may issue the alert at designated intervals to assist in locating the missing senior citizen or person with Alzheimer's disease. SECTION 7. Section 411.388, Government Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 411.388. CONTENT OF SILVER ALERT. The alert must include: (1) all appropriate information that is provided by the local law enforcement agency and that may lead to the safe recovery of the missing senior citizen or person with Alzheimer's disease; and (2) a statement instructing any person with information related to the missing senior citizen or person with Alzheimer's disease to contact a local law enforcement agency. SECTION 8. Section 411.389, Government Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 411.389. TERMINATION OF SILVER ALERT. (a) The director shall terminate any activation of the alert with respect to a particular missing senior citizen or person with Alzheimer's disease not later than the earlier of the date on which: (1) the missing person [senior citizen] is located or the situation is otherwise resolved; or (2) the notification period ends, as determined by department rule. (b) A local law enforcement agency that locates a missing senior citizen or person with Alzheimer's disease who is the subject of an alert under this subchapter shall notify the department as soon as possible that the missing person [senior citizen] has been located. SECTION 9. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2017. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2639 was passed by the House on May 4, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 2639 on May 26, 2017, and requested the appointment of a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 2639 on May 27, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 137, Nays 8, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2639 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 2639 on May 28, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor