E | 06/15/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/15/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6065 | |
E | 05/30/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6062 | |
Senate | 05/29/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4237 | |
House | 05/28/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6032 | |
House | 05/27/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6040 | |
House | 05/25/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4824 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3041 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3041 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3041 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3041 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3041 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3041 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3041 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2072 | |
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1681 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2760 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2548 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Record vote | RV#761 | Journal Page: 2548 |
House | 05/04/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2548 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2548 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2396 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Record vote | RV#696 | Journal Page: 2395 |
House | 05/03/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2395 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Amended | 1-Martinez | Journal Page: 2395 |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2395 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1843 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 794 | |
House | 03/22/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 794 | |
House | 03/01/2017 | Filed |