Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2646 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2017

                    By: Martinez, Guerra (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 2646
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to real property acquired by advance acquisition for a
 transportation facility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 202.021(b), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c) and Section
 202.113(b), real property shall be transferred or sold with the
 following priorities:
 (1)  to a governmental entity with the authority to
 condemn the property; or
 (2)  to the general public.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 202.112(a) and (d), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission may acquire real property or an interest
 in real property or purchase an option to acquire real property for
 possible use in or in connection with a transportation facility
 before:
 (1)  a final decision has been made as to whether the
 transportation facility will be located on that property; or
 (2)  environmental clearance has been issued for the
 transportation facility by the appropriate federal or state
 authority.
 (d)  An option to acquire real property purchased under this
 section [or Section 227.041] may not expire later than the fifth
 anniversary of the date the option was purchased and may be renewed
 for subsequent periods that expire not later than the fifth
 anniversary of the date the option was renewed, by agreement of the
 commission and the grantor of the option or the grantor's heirs or
 assigns.
 SECTION 3.  Section 202.113, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 202.113.  DISPOSAL OF SURPLUS PROPERTY. (a) Except as
 provided by Subsection (b), the [The] commission shall dispose of
 property acquired by advance acquisition that is not needed for a
 transportation facility in the manner provided by Subchapter B.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, the commission first
 shall offer property described by Subsection (a) for sale to the
 person from whom the commission acquired the property at a price
 that is equal to the lesser of:
 (1)  the price the commission paid the person to
 acquire the property; or
 (2)  the fair market value of the property at the time
 it is offered for sale under this subsection, taking into account
 any damage to the property.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *