Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2647 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Stephenson H.B. No. 2647
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Galveston)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 4, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorized investments of public funds.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2256.009(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b), the following are
 authorized investments under this subchapter:
 (1)  obligations, including letters of credit, of the
 United States or its agencies and instrumentalities;
 (2)  direct obligations of this state or its agencies
 and instrumentalities;
 (3)  collateralized mortgage obligations directly
 issued by a federal agency or instrumentality of the United States,
 the underlying security for which is guaranteed by an agency or
 instrumentality of the United States;
 (4)  other obligations, the principal and interest of
 which are unconditionally guaranteed or insured by, or backed by
 the full faith and credit of, this state or the United States or
 their respective agencies and instrumentalities, including
 obligations that are fully guaranteed or insured by the Federal
 Deposit Insurance Corporation or by the explicit full faith and
 credit of the United States;
 (5)  obligations of states, agencies, counties,
 cities, and other political subdivisions of any state rated as to
 investment quality by a nationally recognized investment rating
 firm not less than A or its equivalent; [and]
 (6)  bonds issued, assumed, or guaranteed by the State
 of Israel;
 (7)  interest-bearing banking deposits that are
 guaranteed or insured by:
 (A)  the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation or
 its successor; or
 (B)  the National Credit Union Share Insurance
 Fund or its successor; and
 (8)  interest-bearing banking deposits other than
 those described by Subdivision (7) if:
 (A)  the funds invested in the banking deposits
 are invested through:
 (i)  a broker with a main office or branch
 office in this state that the investing entity selects from a list
 the governing body or designated investment committee of the entity
 adopts as required by Section 2256.025; or
 (ii)  a depository institution with a main
 office or branch office in this state that the investing entity
 selects;
 (B)  the broker or depository institution
 selected as described by Paragraph (A) arranges for the deposit of
 the funds in the banking deposits in one or more federally insured
 depository institutions, regardless of where located, for the
 investing entity's account;
 (C)  the full amount of the principal and accrued
 interest of the banking deposits is insured by the United States or
 an instrumentality of the United States; and
 (D)  the investing entity appoints as the entity's
 custodian of the banking deposits issued for the entity's account:
 (i)  the depository institution selected as
 described by Paragraph (A);
 (ii)  an entity described by Section
 2257.041(d); or
 (iii)  a clearing broker dealer registered
 with the Securities and Exchange Commission and operating under
 Securities and Exchange Commission Rule 15c3-3 (17 C.F.R. Section
 240.15c3-3).
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 authorized investments of public funds governed by Section
 2256.009, Government Code, as amended by this Act, that are made on
 or after the effective date of this Act. An authorized investment
 of public funds made before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect immediately before that date, and that
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *