Senate | 05/03/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1605 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1605 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1230 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1804 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1721 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Record vote | RV#329 | Journal Page: 1721 |
House | 04/20/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1721 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1721 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1678 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1678 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1424 | |
House | 03/27/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/13/2017 | Referred to Pensions | Journal Page: 285 | |
House | 02/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 285 | |
House | 11/14/2016 | Filed |