E
|
06/15/2017
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6065
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4237
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2968
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4729
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4730
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1793
|
Journal Page: 4730
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4729
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4567
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2597
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2597
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2597
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2597
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2597
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2597
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2597
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2072
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1697
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3026
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2763
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#883
|
Journal Page: 2763
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2763
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2763
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2662
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Landgraf
|
Journal Page: 2662
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2662
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/5/17 2:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1803
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 823
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 823
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|