House | 05/06/2017 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2849 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1012 | Journal Page: 2849 |
House | 05/05/2017 | Postponed | 5/6/17 7:30 AM | Journal Page: 2688 |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2688 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1509 | |
House | 04/11/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 824 | |
House | 03/23/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 824 | |
House | 03/01/2017 | Filed |