Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2675 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Dean (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 2675
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 3, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 22, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of State Highway 31 in
 Gregg County as the Jack Ward Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.123 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.123.  JACK WARD MEMORIAL HIGHWAY. (a)  The portion
 of State Highway 31 in Gregg County between its intersection with
 the Smith County line and State Highway 42 is designated as the Jack
 Ward Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Jack Ward Memorial Highway and any other
 appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *