House | 05/10/2017 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3168 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Companion considered in lieu of | CSSB 1107 | Journal Page: 3167 |
House | 05/05/2017 | Postponed | 5/9/17 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2714 |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2714 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2190 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 826 | |
House | 03/23/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 826 | |
House | 03/02/2017 | Filed |