E
|
05/29/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6063
|
E
|
05/19/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4005
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2119
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2116
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3780
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4004
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3734
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1346
|
Journal Page: 3735
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3734
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3235
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1801
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1801
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1801
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1801
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1801
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1801
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1801
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Birdwell
|
Journal Page: 1801
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1800
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 1779
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1779
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1779
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1688
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1010
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1509
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1461
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#231
|
Journal Page: 1460
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1460
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1460
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1444
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1444
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1444
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 777
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 286
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 286
|
House
|
11/14/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|