Senate | 05/12/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1914 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1914 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1906 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3456 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Record vote | RV#1174 | Journal Page: 3278 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3278 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3278 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3232 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Amendment adopted as amended | 1-Schofield | Journal Page: 3232 |
House | 05/10/2017 | Amendment amended | 2-Hinojosa | Journal Page: 3232 |
House | 05/10/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | 1-Schofield | Journal Page: 3231 |
House | 05/10/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3231 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2459 | |
House | 04/24/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 903 | |
House | 03/28/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 903 | |
House | 03/02/2017 | Filed |